Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wacław Paprocki

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland

Titular Bishop of Margarita


Events

DateEventTitle
11 Apr 1639AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
11 Apr 1639AppointedTitular Bishop of Margarita
18 Sep 1639Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Margarita
1643¹DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Wacław Paprocki (VIAF: 163336730)
Bishop Wacław Paprocki (died 1643) Auxiliary Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze)

  • a bishop for 3.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 231
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1639, Number 20
  • fn: JI, 1 Apr 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 3 Apr 2019

Quantcast