Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe (Giacomo) Pamphilj

Deceased

Bishop of Kotor (Cattaro), Montenegro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1580¹Born
15 Jun 162040.4AppointedBishop of Kotor (Cattaro), Montenegro
9 Aug 162040.6Ordained BishopBishop of Kotor (Cattaro), Montenegro
1622¹42.0DiedBishop of Kotor (Cattaro), Montenegro

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe (Giacomo) Pamphilj
Bishop Giuseppe (Giacomo) Pamphilj (born 1580, died 1622) Bishop of Kotor (Cattaro)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChiggia, Diocese of Chioggia, Italy
Ordained BishopOgnisanti, Church, Venezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}, Italy

  • a bishop for 1.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 142
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1620, Number 27
  • ob/c2+: AT, 30 Jan 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 239, Number 20,057

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast