Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sigismondo Donati

Deceased

Bishop of Ascoli Piceno


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1552¹Born
17 Aug 159846.6AppointedBishop of Venosa, Italy
7 Jan 160553.0AppointedBishop of Ascoli Piceno, Italy
14 Nov 161866.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Venice, Italy
12 May 162169.3ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Venice, Italy
19 Nov 164189.8DiedBishop of Ascoli Piceno, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Sigismondo Donati
Bishop Sigismondo Donati (born 1552, died ) Bishop of Ascoli Piceno

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 364, and Page 97
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 330
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes, Page 264

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 6 Oct 2016