Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domingo de Orueta y Caceaga

Deceased

Bishop of Almería


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1633¹BornBilbao
10 Nov 168754.8AppointedBishop of Almería, Spain
25 Feb 168855.1Ordained BishopBishop of Almería, Spain
4 Mar 170168.1DiedBishop of Almería, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Domingo de Orueta y Caceaga:
Bishop Domingo de Orueta y Caceaga (born 1633, died ) Bishop of Almería

  • a bishop for 13.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,450
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 79
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 230, Number 1,430
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1688, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015