Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Diego de La Cueva y Aldana

Deceased

Bishop of Valladolid


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1638²BornMadrid
1666²28.0Ordained PriestPriest
6 Jul 168244.5SelectedBishop of Valladolid, Spain
24 May 168345.4ConfirmedBishop of Valladolid, Spain
25 Jul 168345.6Ordained BishopBishop of Valladolid, Spain
28 Jul 170769.6DiedBishop of Valladolid, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Diego de La Cueva y Aldana:
Bishop Diego de La Cueva y Aldana (died ) Bishop of Valladolid

  • a priest for 41.6 years
  • a bishop for 24.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 403
  • b/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 128, Number 11,513
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 224, Number 1,388

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 1 Nov 2013