Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Máximo Francisco Joániz de Echalaz

Deceased

Bishop of Cartagena (en España)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Dec 1624BornMuruzábal
Nov 1694³69.8Ordained PriestPriest
16 May 169570.4AppointedBishop of Cartagena (en España)
28 Aug 169570.7Ordained BishopBishop of Cartagena (en España)
17 Nov 169570.9DiedBishop of Cartagena (en España)

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Máximo Francisco Joániz de Echalaz:
Bishop Máximo Francisco Joániz de Echalaz (born , died ) Bishop of Cartagena (en España)

  • a priest for 1.0 years
  • a bishop for .2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 237, Number 1,473

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 1 Nov 2013