Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alfonso Lorenzo de Pedraza, O.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Palencia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1628¹BornCabra
28 Apr 168557.3SelectedBishop of Palencia, Spain
9 Jul 168557.5ConfirmedBishop of Palencia, Spain
16 Feb 171183.1DiedBishop of Palencia, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alfonso Lorenzo de Pedraza:
Bishop Alfonso Lorenzo de Pedraza O.M. (born 1628, died ) Bishop of Palencia

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 304
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 227, Number 1,411
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1685, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 29 Jun 2015