Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Orsini

Deceased

Bishop of Aversa


Events

DateEventTitle
11 Apr 1580AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Spoleto, Italy
11 Apr 1580AppointedTitular Bishop of Hippos
17 Apr 1580Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hippos
16 May 1581SucceededBishop of Spoleto, Italy
5 Apr 1591AppointedBishop of Aversa, Italy
1598²DiedBishop of Aversa, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pietro Orsini:
Bishop Pietro Orsini Bishop of Aversa

  • a bishop for 17.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 303, and Page 126
  • ob/c2+: CB, 29 Sep 2011

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013