Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Malachy O’Queely

Deceased

Archbishop of Tuam


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1585¹BornDrizza
28 Jun 163045.4AppointedArchbishop of Tuam, Ireland
10 Oct 1630³45.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Tuam, Ireland
26 Oct 164560.8DiedArchbishop of Tuam, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Malachy O’Queely:
Archbishop Malachy O’Queely (died ) Archbishop of Tuam

  • a bishop for 15.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 112, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 348
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1630, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 19 Mar 2015