Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Richard Arthur

Deceased

Bishop of Limerick, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1560Born
18 May 162060.3AppointedBishop of Limerick, Ireland
17 Sep 162363.7Ordained BishopBishop of Limerick, Ireland
23 May 164686.3DiedBishop of Limerick, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Richard Arthur
Bishop Richard Arthur (born 1560, died ) Bishop of Limerick

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCork

  • a bishop for 22.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 221
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1623, Number 29
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 225

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018