Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop John de Burgh

Deceased

Archbishop of Tuam, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1600¹Born
16 Sep 164141.7AppointedBishop of Clonfert, Ireland
29 May 164242.4Ordained BishopBishop of Clonfert, Ireland
11 Mar 164747.1AppointedArchbishop of Tuam, Ireland
4 Apr 166767.2DiedArchbishop of Tuam, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for John de Burgh
Archbishop John de Burgh (born 1600, died ) Archbishop of Tuam

EventPlace
Birth PlacePales

  • a bishop for 24.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 348, and Page 154
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1642, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast