Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Owen Oglethorpe

Deceased

Bishop of Carlisle, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1502¹Born
24 Mar 155755.2AppointedBishop of Carlisle, England, Great Britain
15 Aug 155755.6Ordained BishopBishop of Carlisle, England, Great Britain
31 Dec 155957.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Carlisle, England, Great Britain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Owen Oglethorpe
Bishop Owen Oglethorpe (born 1502, died ) Bishop of Carlisle

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNewton Kyme, near Tadcaster
Ordained BishopSaint Nicholas, Church, Chiswick
Buried Place (Original)St. Dunstan-in-the-West Churchyard, Fleet Street, London, Diocese of London, England

  • a bishop for 2.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 3, Page 241
  • b/c2+: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 153
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 105
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1557, Number 6
  • loc/d: CB, 22 Aug 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast