Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Glyn

Deceased

Bishop of Bangor, Wales


Events

DateEventTitle
21 Jun 1555AppointedBishop of Bangor, Wales, Great Britain
8 Sep 1555Ordained BishopBishop of Bangor, Wales, Great Britain
21 May 1558DiedBishop of Bangor, Wales, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for William Glyn:
Bishop William Glyn (died ) Bishop of Bangor

  • a bishop for 2.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 104
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 129
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 104

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013