Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Maurice Griffith

Deceased

Bishop of Rochester, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
1 Apr 1554Ordained BishopBishop of Rochester, England, Great Britain
6 Jul 1554ConfirmedBishop of Rochester, England, Great Britain
20 Nov 1558DiedBishop of Rochester, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Maurice Griffith
Bishop Maurice Griffith (died ) Bishop of Rochester

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSauveur, Chapel, Southwark, Diocese of London, England

  • a bishop for 4.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 286
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 571
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 104
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1554, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast