Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Nicholas Heath

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of York, England


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1501BornLondon
26 Mar 154039.2SelectedBishop of Rochester, England, Great Britain
4 Apr 154039.3Ordained BishopBishop of Rochester, England, Great Britain
22 Dec 154343.0SelectedBishop of Worcester, England, Great Britain
155150.0ResignedBishop of Worcester, England, Great Britain
155453.0AppointedBishop of Worcester, England, Great Britain
19 Feb 155554.1SelectedArchbishop of York, England, Great Britain
21 Jun 155554.5ConfirmedArchbishop of York, England, Great Britain
155958.0ResignedArchbishop of York, England, Great Britain
Dec 157877.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of York, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Nicholas Heath:
Archbishop Nicholas Heath Archbishop Emeritus of York

  • a bishop for 38.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 569
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 3, Page 63, and Page 64
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 3, Page 114
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 190
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 102

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013