Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cuthbert Scott

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Chester, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
6 Jul 1556AppointedBishop of Chester, England, Great Britain
21 Jun 1559ResignedBishop of Chester, England, Great Britain
9 Oct 1564DiedBishop Emeritus of Chester, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Cuthbert Scott (VIAF: 73726285)
Bishop Cuthbert Scott (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Chester

EventPlace
Death PlaceLouvain, Belgium

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 164
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1556, Number 10
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 81, Number 6,577
  • d: CB, 2 Sep 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 3 Sep 2021

Quantcast