Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jakob Ulvsson

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Uppsala, Sweden


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1430¹Born
18 Dec 146939.9AppointedArchbishop of Uppsala, Sweden
15 Apr 147040.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Uppsala, Sweden
1515²85.0ResignedArchbishop of Uppsala, Sweden
1521¹91.0DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Uppsala, Sweden

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jakob Ulvsson (VIAF: 45213416)
Archbishop Jakob Ulvsson (born 1430, died 1521) Archbishop Emeritus of Uppsala

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSte. Brigitte, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 50.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 260
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 118, Number 10,510
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1470, Number 5
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 323
  • ln: JI, 1 Apr 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 3 Apr 2019

Quantcast