Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lauri Mikel Suurpää

Deceased

Bishop of Åbo, Finland


Events

DateEventTitle
7 Aug 1500AppointedBishop of Åbo, Finland
15 Aug 1501Ordained BishopBishop of Åbo, Finland
28 Sep 1506DiedBishop of Åbo, Finland

MicroData Summary for Lauri Mikel Suurpää
Bishop Lauri Mikel Suurpää (died ) Bishop of Åbo

EventPlace
Ordained BishopUpsal, Archdiocese of Uppsala, Sweden

  • a bishop for 5.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1501, Number 5
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 77
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 91
  • nm: JI, 1 Apr 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 3 Apr 2019

Quantcast