Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Maunu Särkilahti

Deceased

Bishop of Åbo, Finland


Events

DateEventTitle
6 Jul 1489AppointedBishop of Åbo, Finland
24 Jun 1490Ordained BishopBishop of Åbo, Finland
12 Mar 1500DiedBishop of Åbo, Finland

MicroData Summary for Maunu Särkilahti
Bishop Maunu Särkilahti (died ) Bishop of Åbo

EventPlace
Ordained BishopUppsala, Archdiocese of Uppsala, Sweden

  • a bishop for 9.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 77
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117, Number 10,417
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1490, Number 4
  • nm: JI, 1 Apr 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 3 Apr 2019

Quantcast