Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edmund O’Dwyer

Deceased

Bishop of Limerick


Events

DateEventTitle
6 Feb 1645AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Limerick, Ireland
6 Feb 1645AppointedTitular Bishop of Calama
7 May 1645Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Calama
23 May 1646SucceededBishop of Limerick, Ireland
5 Apr 1664DiedBishop of Limerick, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Edmund O’Dwyer:
Bishop Edmund O’Dwyer (died ) Bishop of Limerick

  • a bishop for 18.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 128, and Page 221
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1645, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 22 Mar 2015