Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antoine Godeau

Deceased

Bishop of Vence, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Sep 1605Born
21 Jun 163630.7SelectedBishop of Grasse, France
22 Sep 163630.9ConfirmedBishop of Grasse, France
14 Dec 163631.2Ordained BishopBishop of Grasse, France
20 Dec 163934.2AppointedBishop of Vence, France
10 Nov 165348.1ResignedBishop of Grasse, France
17 Apr 167266.5DiedBishop of Vence, France

MicroData Summary for Antoine Godeau
Bishop Antoine Godeau (born , died ) Bishop of Vence

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDreux

  • a bishop for 35.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 196, and Page 361
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1636, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018