Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernard Despruets

Deceased

Bishop of Saint-Papoul


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1583¹BornGaros
30 Mar 163653.2SelectedBishop of Saint-Papoul, France
1 Sep 163653.6ConfirmedBishop of Saint-Papoul, France
9 Nov 163653.8Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Papoul, France
20 Jul 165572.5DiedBishop of Saint-Papoul, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bernard Despruets:
Bishop Bernard Despruets (born 1583, died ) Bishop of Saint-Papoul

  • a bishop for 18.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 274
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1636, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 1 Jul 2015