Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Martin Nugk von Lichtenhoff

Deceased

Prefect of Meißen (Meissen) {Lusazia o Lausitz; Sassonia}

Titular Bishop of Cisamus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Oct 1720BornWittichenau
31 May 174423.6Ordained PriestPriest of Meißen (Meissen) {Lusazia o Lausitz; Sassonia}, Germany
17 Jan 177453.3AppointedPrefect of Meißen (Meissen) {Lusazia o Lausitz; Sassonia}, Germany
15 Nov 177555.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Cisamus
12 May 177655.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cisamus
21 Jun 178059.7DiedPrefect of Meißen (Meissen) {Lusazia o Lausitz; Sassonia}, Germany

MicroData Summary for Martin Nugk von Lichtenhoff:
Bishop Martin Nugk von Lichtenhoff (born , died ) Prefect of Meißen (Meissen) {Lusazia o Lausitz; Sassonia}

  • a priest for 36.1 years
  • a bishop for 4.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Number 15,656
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013