Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Basilio Nasser

Deceased

Bishop of Baalbek (Melkite Greek), Lebanon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Aug 1839Born
17 Oct 186930.1AppointedBishop of Baalbek (Melkite Greek), Lebanon
17 Oct 186930.1Ordained BishopBishop of Baalbek (Melkite Greek), Lebanon
26 Sep 188546.1DiedBishop of Baalbek (Melkite Greek), Lebanon

MicroData Summary for Basilio Nasser
Bishop Basilio Nasser (born , died ) Bishop of Baalbek

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDamasco
Ordained BishopDamas

  • a bishop for 15.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1869, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 17 Feb 2017