Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Bernardo Merizalde Morales, O.A.R. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Tumaco, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 May 1891Born
1 Feb 190816.7ProfessedMember of Order of Augustinian Recollects
4 Oct 191423.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Augustinian Recollects
30 Mar 192836.8AppointedPrefect of Tumaco, Colombia
Nov 1947³56.4ResignedPrefect of Tumaco, Colombia
24 Apr 197179.9DiedPrefect Emeritus of Tumaco, Colombia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bernardo Merizalde Morales
Father Bernardo Merizalde Morales O.A.R. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Tumaco

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBogotá
Death PlacePamplona, Archdiocese of Pamplona (-Tudela), Spain

  • a priest for 56.5 years

Source(s):
  • r: CB, 7 Apr 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 8 Apr 2019

Quantcast