Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonio Maturi, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Syros (e Milos)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jan 1686³BornPinzolo, Italy
6 Jun 171630.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
15 Apr 172236.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Izmir (Smirne), Turkey
21 May 173145.3AppointedBishop of Syros (e Milos), Greece
6 Apr 173246.2Ordained BishopBishop of Syros (e Milos), Greece
13 Apr 173347.2AppointedArchbishop of Naxos, Greece
21 Jul 174963.5ResignedArchbishop of Naxos, Greece
21 Jul 174963.5AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Syros (e Milos), Greece
Oct 1750³64.7DiedBishop of Syros (e Milos), Greece

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Maturi:
Archbishop Antonio Maturi O.F.M. (born , died Oct 1750) Bishop of Syros (e Milos)

  • a priest for 34.3 years
  • a bishop for 18.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 360
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 302, and Page 390
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1732, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015