Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Raimondo Gallani, O.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa)


Events

DateEventTitle
19 Jan 1708AppointedTitular Archbishop of Ancyra
23 Mar 1722AppointedArchbishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia
10 Mar 1727DiedArchbishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Raimondo Gallani:
Archbishop Raimondo Gallani O.P. (died ) Archbishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa)

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 84, and Page 327

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013