Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Philippus Bavestrelli

Deceased

Bishop of Chios (Scio)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1670¹BornChios
9 Aug 171545.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Izmir (Smirne), Turkey
1718¹48.0ResignedVicar Apostolic of Izmir (Smirne), Turkey
30 Sep 172050.7AppointedBishop of Chios (Scio), Greece
May 1721³51.3Ordained BishopBishop of Chios (Scio), Greece
6 Apr 175484.2DiedBishop of Chios (Scio), Greece

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Philippus Bavestrelli:
Bishop Philippus Bavestrelli (born 1670, died ) Bishop of Chios (Scio)

  • a bishop for 32.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 158, and Page 360
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1721, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015