Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jan Lutek

Deceased

Bishop of Kraków, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1405¹Born
6 Jul 146358.5SelectedBishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
14 Dec 146358.9ConfirmedBishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
4 Mar 146459.1Ordained BishopBishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
19 Oct 146459.7AppointedBishop of Kraków, Poland
24 May 147166.3DiedBishop of Kraków, Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jan Lutek
Bishop Jan Lutek (born 1405, died ) Bishop of Kraków

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBrzezie
Ordained BishopSainte Marie Lanciciensis

  • a bishop for 7.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 139, and Page 270
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,464, Number 2
  • ob: JI, 23 Jul 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast