Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Wincenty Kot z Dębna (Dembicy)

Deceased

Archbishop of Gniezno, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1395¹Born
15 Mar 143742.2AppointedArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland
3 Sep 143742.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland
14 Aug 144853.6DiedArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Wincenty Kot z Dębna (Dembicy)
Archbishop Wincenty Kot z Dębna (Dembicy) (born 1395, died ) Archbishop of Gniezno

EventPlace
Ordained BishopCathedral, Gniezno, Archdiocese of Gniezno

  • a bishop for 10.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 160
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 241, Number 20,192
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Number 4,171

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.5, 5 Oct 2019; Data: 7 Oct 2019

Quantcast