Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gilles de Laval-Loué

Deceased

Bishop of Sées {Séez}, France


Events

DateEventTitle
1478²AppointedBishop of Sées {Séez}, France
29 Apr 1481Ordained BishopBishop of Sées {Séez}, France
19 Dec 1493AppointedBishop of Sées {Séez}, France
3 Oct 1502DiedBishop of Sées {Séez}, France

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gilles de Laval-Loué
Bishop Gilles de Laval-Loué (died ) Bishop of Sées {Séez}

  • a bishop for 21.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 227
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1481, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 1 Dec 2018

Quantcast