Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Charles de Neufchâtel

Deceased

Archbishop of Besançon, France

Administrator of Bayeux


Events

DateEventTitle
14 Apr 1463AppointedArchbishop of Besançon, France
6 Mar 1480AppointedAdministrator of Bayeux, France
20 Jul 1498DiedArchbishop of Besançon, France

MicroData Summary for Charles de Neufchâtel
Archbishop Charles de Neufchâtel (died ) Archbishop of Besançon

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 106, and Page 101
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1463, Number 25*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 1 Dec 2018

Quantcast