Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Leonhard von Laiming

Deceased

Bishop of Passau


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1381BornRosenheim
141433.0Ordained PriestPriest of Passau, Germany
Jul 142342.5SelectedBishop of Passau, Germany
10 Jan 142443.0ConfirmedBishop of Passau, Germany
24 Jun 145170.5DiedBishop of Passau, Germany

MicroData Summary for Leonhard von Laiming:
Bishop Leonhard von Laiming (died ) Bishop of Passau

  • a priest for 37.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 393
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 121, Number 10,838
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 213

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013