Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Robert Cardinal Kilwardby, O.P. †

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1215¹BornLeicestershire
1 Oct 127257.7AppointedArchbishop of Canterbury, England, Great Britain
26 Feb 127358.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Canterbury, England, Great Britain
12 Mar 127863.1AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina
12 Mar 127863.1Elevated to Cardinal
12 Sep 127964.6DiedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Robert Kilwardby
Robert Cardinal Kilwardby O.P. (born 1215, died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina

  • a bishop for 6.5 years
  • a cardinal for 1.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 12 Mar 1278
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 14
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 64

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 24 Mar 2016