Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop János Kéry, O.S.P.P.E. †

Deceased

Bishop of Vác


Events

DateEventTitle
5 Dec 1678AppointedBishop of Csanád, Hungary
10 Mar 1680Ordained BishopBishop of Csanád, Hungary
8 Jun 1682AppointedBishop of Vác, Hungary
3 Mar 1685DiedBishop of Vác, Hungary

MicroData Summary for János Kéry:
Bishop János Kéry O.S.P.P.E. (died ) Bishop of Vác

  • a bishop for 4.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 177, and Page 358
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 402

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015