Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ferdinandus Pállfy ab Erdöd

Deceased

Bishop of Eger, Hungary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1622¹Born
27 Feb 167351.1AppointedBishop of Csanád, Hungary
3 May 167351.3Ordained BishopBishop of Csanád, Hungary
5 Sep 167856.6AppointedBishop of Eger, Hungary
31 Oct 168058.8DiedBishop of Eger, Hungary

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ferdinandus Pállfy ab Erdöd
Bishop Ferdinandus Pállfy ab Erdöd (born 1622, died ) Bishop of Eger

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVienne

  • a bishop for 7.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 73, and Page 177
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1673, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018