Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giorgio Maria Trivulzio, B. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Esztergom, Hungary

Titular Bishop of Azotus


Events

DateEventTitle
7 Nov 1678AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Esztergom, Hungary
7 Nov 1678AppointedTitular Bishop of Azotus
12 Feb 1679Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Azotus
1689²DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Esztergom, Hungary

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giorgio Maria Trivulzio
Bishop Giorgio Maria Trivulzio B. (died 1689) Auxiliary Bishop of Esztergom

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMilano, Italy
Ordained Bishopchapelle impériale de l’Impératrice Veuve, Wien, Diocese of Wien, Austria

  • a bishop for 9.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 110
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1679, Number 1
  • bp/ob/c2+: CB, 19 Jul 2016
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Number 19,034

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018