Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop David Kearney

Deceased

Archbishop of Cashel


Events

DateEventTitle
21 May 1603AppointedArchbishop of Cashel, Ireland
31 Aug 1603Ordained BishopArchbishop of Cashel, Ireland
14 Aug 1624DiedArchbishop of Cashel, Ireland

MicroData Summary for David Kearney:
Archbishop David Kearney (died ) Archbishop of Cashel

  • a bishop for 20.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 138
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1603, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 6 Feb 2015