Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jules-Basile Kandelaft

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Le Caire {Cairo} (Syrian), Egypt

Titular Archbishop of Palmyra

Titular See: Ioppe de Siro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1848¹Born
25 Dec 189345.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Damas (Syrian), Syria
25 Dec 189345.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Ioppe
25 Dec 189345.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ioppe
24 Oct 190254.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Le Caire {Cairo} (Syrian), Egypt
24 Oct 190254.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Palmyra
1 Jan 191466.0DiedVicar Apostolic of Le Caire {Cairo} (Syrian), Egypt

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jules-Basile Kandelaft
Archbishop Jules-Basile Kandelaft (born 1848, died ) Vicar Apostolic of Le Caire {Cairo}

  • a bishop for 20.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: CB
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1893, Number 72

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018