Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Juániz de Echalar

Deceased

Bishop of Calahorra y La Calzada


Events

DateEventTitle
28 Nov 1644SelectedBishop of Mondoñedo, Spain
31 Jul 1645ConfirmedBishop of Mondoñedo, Spain
16 Dec 1647AppointedBishop of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain
13 Oct 1656DiedBishop of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain

MicroData Summary for Juan Juániz de Echalar:
Bishop Juan Juániz de Echalar (died ) Bishop of Calahorra y La Calzada

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,860
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 128, and Page 243
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 176, Number 1,092

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015