Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles de Joyeuse

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Saint-Flour, France


Events

DateEventTitle
10 Sep 1483AppointedBishop of Saint-Flour, France
4 Apr 1484Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Flour, France
1500¹ResignedBishop of Saint-Flour, France
22 Aug 1502DiedBishop Emeritus of Saint-Flour, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Charles de Joyeuse
Bishop Charles de Joyeuse (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Saint-Flour

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSte. Anne, Avignon

  • a bishop for 18.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 155
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1484, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 10 Dec 2018

Quantcast