Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Francisco Cardinal Jiménez de Cisneros, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Toledo, Spain

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Balbina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1436¹Born
20 Feb 149559.1AppointedArchbishop of Toledo, Spain
11 Oct 149559.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Toledo, Spain
May 1507³71.3Elevated to Cardinal
17 May 150771.3InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Balbina
8 Nov 151781.8DiedArchbishop of Toledo, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Jiménez de Cisneros (VIAF: 86852237)
Francisco Cardinal Jiménez de Cisneros O.F.M. Obs. (born 1436, died ) Archbishop of Toledo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTorrelaguna, Archdiocese of Toledo
Ordained BishopFranciscan, Church, Tarazona, Diocese of Tarazona
Death PlaceRoa, Monastery, Burgos, Diocese of Burgos
Buried Place (Original)San Justo, Alcalá de Henares
Buried Place (Current)Cathedral, Alcalá de Henares

  • a bishop for 22.0 years
  • a cardinal for 10.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, May 1507
  • bp/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 140
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 311, Number 208
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 252
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1495, Number 7
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 80, Number 6,463
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 85, Number 7,039

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast