Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Ingaldesthorp

Deceased

Bishop of Rochester, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
9 Jul 1283ConfirmedBishop of Rochester, England, Great Britain
26 Sep 1283Ordained BishopBishop of Rochester, England, Great Britain
12 May 1291DiedBishop of Rochester, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Thomas Ingaldesthorp
Bishop Thomas Ingaldesthorp (died ) Bishop of Rochester

EventPlace
Ordained BishopCanterbury, Archdiocese of Canterbury, England

  • a bishop for 7.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 422
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 66
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 562
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 84, Number 6,909

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast