Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Richard Gravesend

Deceased

Bishop of London, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
9 May 1280SelectedBishop of London, England, Great Britain
11 Aug 1280Ordained BishopBishop of London, England, Great Britain
9 Dec 1303DiedBishop of London, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Richard Gravesend
Bishop Richard Gravesend (died ) Bishop of London

EventPlace
Ordained BishopCoventry

  • a bishop for 23.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 66
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 288
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 84, Number 6,904

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast