Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antoine Havet, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Namur {Namen}, Belgium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1513¹Born
10 Mar 156148.1AppointedBishop of Namur {Namen}, Belgium
14 Jun 156249.4Ordained BishopBishop of Namur {Namen}, Belgium
30 Nov 157865.9DiedBishop of Namur {Namen}, Belgium

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antoine Havet
Bishop Antoine Havet O.P. (born 1513, died ) Bishop of Namur {Namen}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSimoncourt, Pas de Calais, France
Ordained BishopSaint-Sauveur, Abbey, Anchin
Death PlaceNamur, Diocese of Namur {Namen}

  • a bishop for 16.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1562, Number 6
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 252

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018