Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franz von Hatzfeld

Deceased

Bishop of Würzburg, Germany

Bishop of Bamberg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Sep 1596Born
7 Aug 163134.9SelectedBishop of Würzburg, Germany
3 Jan 163235.3ConfirmedBishop of Würzburg, Germany
4 Aug 163336.8SelectedBishop of Bamberg, Germany
31 Oct 163337.1ConfirmedBishop of Bamberg, Germany
12 Apr 163740.5Ordained BishopBishop of Würzburg, Germany
30 Jul 164245.8DiedBishop of Würzburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Franz von Hatzfeld
Bishop Franz von Hatzfeld (born , died ) Bishop of Würzburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCrottorf

  • a bishop for 5.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 109
  • ob/c2: CB, 23 Mar 2014
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1637, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018