Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Goodrich

Deceased

Bishop of Ely, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
17 Mar 1534SelectedBishop of Ely, England, Great Britain
13 Apr 1534ConfirmedBishop of Ely, England, Great Britain
19 Apr 1534Ordained BishopBishop of Ely, England, Great Britain
10 May 1554DiedBishop of Ely, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Thomas Goodrich
Bishop Thomas Goodrich (died ) Bishop of Ely

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLast Kirby, Lincolnshire
Ordained BishopCroydon

  • a bishop for 20.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 341
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 192
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 99
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1534, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast