Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Giustiniani

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Treviso, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jan 1554Born
18 Jul 160551.5AppointedBishop of Treviso, Italy
24 Aug 160551.5Ordained BishopBishop of Treviso, Italy
1623²68.9ResignedBishop of Treviso, Italy
1641²86.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Treviso, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Giustiniani
Bishop Francesco Giustiniani (born , died 1641) Bishop Emeritus of Treviso

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}
Ordained BishopGesù, roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceSalla

  • a bishop for 35.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 329
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1605, Number 35
  • bd/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 223, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob/c2: AT, 12 Mar 2017
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 231, Number 19,246

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast