Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Théophile Joseph Georgi

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Arethusa dei Siri


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Apr 1868BornBagdad
14 May 189325.1Ordained PriestPriest
26 Feb 192152.8SelectedTitular Bishop of Arethusa dei Siri
21 Nov 192153.6ConfirmedTitular Bishop of Arethusa dei Siri
30 Apr 192254.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arethusa dei Siri
1942²73.7DiedTitular Bishop of Arethusa dei Siri

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Théophile Joseph Georgi:
Bishop Théophile Joseph Georgi (born ) Titular Bishop of Arethusa dei Siri

  • a priest for 48.6 years
  • a bishop for 19.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1933
  • b: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1922, Number 13
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 66

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013