Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Félix-Henri de Fumel

Deceased

Bishop of Lodève


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1715¹BornToulouse
22 Mar 175035.2SelectedBishop of Lodève, France
25 May 175035.3ConfirmedBishop of Lodève, France
5 Jul 175035.5Ordained BishopBishop of Lodève, France
26 Jan 179075.0DiedBishop of Lodève, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean-Félix-Henri de Fumel:
Bishop Jean-Félix-Henri de Fumel (born 1715, died ) Bishop of Lodève

  • a bishop for 39.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1750, Number 12
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 264

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 21 Dec 2015